Global Patent Index - EP 0992685 A3

EP 0992685 A3 2001-01-31 - Electronic flow control of a household pump

Title (en)

Electronic flow control of a household pump

Title (de)

Elektronische Durchflussregelung einer Haushaltspumpe

Title (fr)

Régulation électronique du débit d'une pompe ménagère

Publication

EP 0992685 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119759 A

Priority

  • DE 19846047 A
  • DE 19923350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992685A2] The pump unit has a pump driven by an electric motor, provided with a pump chamber (8) having at least one pump input (10) and at least one pump output (11) and an integrated pump control for controlling the pump in accordance with a supplied electric, electromagnetic, optical and/or acoustic control signal, e.g. a remote-control signal. An Independent claim for a control device for a domestic pump unit is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 53/10; F04B 17/06; F04B 53/20; F04D 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 15/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 15/02 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992685 A2 20000412; EP 0992685 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 53/10 A, 7F 04B 53/20 B, 7F 04D 13/06 B, 7F 04B 17/06 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI