Global Patent Index - EP 0992686 A2

EP 0992686 A2 2000-04-12 - Valve operated discharge control of a household pump

Title (en)

Valve operated discharge control of a household pump

Title (de)

Ventilgesteuerte Durchflussregelung einer Haushaltspumpe

Title (fr)

Régulation du débit d'une pompe ménagère avec une soupape

Publication

EP 0992686 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119757 A

Priority

  • DE 19846047 A
  • DE 19923351 A

Abstract (en)

The pump unit has a pump driven by an electric motor, provided with a pump chamber (8) having a pump input (10) and a pump output (11) and integrated flow control and/or monitoring devices (26,27), e.g. inserted in a pressure line (25) connected to the pump output. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) a non-return valve; (b) a pressure-sensitive switching device

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung beschrieben, die insbesondere im Haus und/oder Gartenbereich beispielsweise als Pumpe eines Hauswasserwerks verwendbar ist. Sie hat eine Flüssigkeitspumpe mit einer Pumpenkammer (8) in die ein Pumpeneingang (10) hineinführt und aus der ein Pumpenausgang (11) herausführt, wobei ein durch die Pumpe geförderter Flüssigkeitsstrom durch Pumpeneingang und Pumpenausgang führt. Der Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung sind mehrere in den Aufbau der Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung integrierbare, durchströmbare Funktionseinheiten (26, 27) zur Beeinflussung und/oder Überwachung des Flüssigkeitsstromes zugeordnet. Dieser modulare Aufbau macht die Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung besonders wartungsfreundlich und leicht an gewünschte Anwendungen anpaßbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 17/06 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 17/06 (2013.01); F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992686 A2 20000412; EP 0992686 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 13/06 A, 7F 04B 17/06 B, 7F 04D 29/42 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI