Global Patent Index - EP 0992686 A3

EP 0992686 A3 2001-03-07 - Valve operated discharge control of a household pump

Title (en)

Valve operated discharge control of a household pump

Title (de)

Ventilgesteuerte Durchflussregelung einer Haushaltspumpe

Title (fr)

Régulation du débit d'une pompe ménagère avec une soupape

Publication

EP 0992686 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119757 A

Priority

  • DE 19846047 A
  • DE 19923351 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992686A2] The pump unit has a pump driven by an electric motor, provided with a pump chamber (8) having a pump input (10) and a pump output (11) and integrated flow control and/or monitoring devices (26,27), e.g. inserted in a pressure line (25) connected to the pump output. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) a non-return valve; (b) a pressure-sensitive switching device

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/06; F04B 17/06; F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 17/06 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 17/06 (2013.01); F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992686 A2 20000412; EP 0992686 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 13/06 A, 7F 04B 17/06 B, 7F 04D 29/42 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI