Global Patent Index - EP 0992692 A1

EP 0992692 A1 2000-04-12 - Fan including a duct for cooling the motor

Title (en)

Fan including a duct for cooling the motor

Title (de)

Lüfter mit Kühlkanal für den Motor

Title (fr)

Ventilateur avec canal de refroidissement pour le moteur

Publication

EP 0992692 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119896 A

Priority

IT TO980850 A

Abstract (en)

The duct (3) includes an annular outer wall (10), defining internally an axial flow passage (11) and surrounding, in use, the rotor (4) of the motorized fan (2). Downstream of the motorized fan (2), the wall (10) is connected by a plurality of spokes (12) to a central support structure (13) to which the motor (8) of the motorized fan (2) is fixed. At least one spoke (12) is shaped so as to define a conduit (14) with a radially outer inlet aperture (15) acting to capture a portion of the air stream generated by the operation of the motorized fan (2), and a radially inner outlet aperture (16) facing the region occupied by the motor (8) of the motorized fan (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992692 A1 20000412; EP 0992692 B1 20041117; DE 69921930 D1 20041223; DE 69921930 T2 20050331; IT 1303112 B1 20001030; IT TO980850 A1 20000409

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091007

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921930 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GATE S.R.L.

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI