Global Patent Index - EP 0992721 A1

EP 0992721 A1 2000-04-12 - Improved brush seal

Title (en)

Improved brush seal

Title (de)

Bürstendichtung

Title (fr)

Joint à brosses

Publication

EP 0992721 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307871 A

Priority

GB 9821927 A

Abstract (en)

A brush seal (2) designed for use between regions of high pressure differential and in an environment in which there is disturbed flow has a bristle pack sub-divided into a plurality of bristle pack regions (8,10,12,14) with a leaky diaphragm (22) between each region. The brush seal (2) may comprise an assembly of individual seals (8-14) with diaphragms (22-26) between them or a single bristle pack which is sub-divided by at least one internal diaphragm (22). The diaphragms (22-26) are preferably compliant and designed to allow a predetermined leakage flow between bristle regions. The leakage flow has several functions: it causes the pressure differential across the whole seal assembly to be more evenly distributed, and by providing an amount of flow in each pack this acts to calm the bristles thus helping to ensure each bristle region effectively contributes to the seal performance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16J 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/00 (2006.01); F16J 15/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16J 15/006 (2013.01); F16J 15/3288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992721 A1 20000412; EP 0992721 B1 20040407; DE 69916202 D1 20040513; DE 69916202 T2 20050310; GB 2342411 A 20000412; GB 2342411 B 20010418; GB 9821927 D0 19981202; GB 9923515 D0 19991208; US 6308957 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916202

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916202 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI