Global patent index - EP 0992732 A2

EP 0992732 A2 2000-04-12 - Production of gas mixtures in large quantities

Title (en)

Production of gas mixtures in large quantities

Title (de)

Herstellung von Gasgemischen in grossen Mengen

Title (fr)

Préparation de mélanges de gaz en grandes quantités

Publication

EP 0992732 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116523 A

Priority

DE 19846288 A

Abstract (en)

Production of gas mixtures comprises filling the components of the gas mixture into one or more pressurized gas containers having a capacity of at least 100 m<3> at 200 bar at the same time or subsequently, and measuring the gas pressure in the container using a pressure measuring device.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gasgemischen werden die Gaskomponenten des Gasgemisches in einen oder mehrere Druckgasbehälter mit einem Fassungsvermögen von mindestens 100 m<3> bei 200 bar gleichzeitig oder nacheinander gefüllt werden, wobei mittels einer Druckerfassungseinrichtung, vorzugsweise temperaturkompensiert, an mindestens einem Druckgasbehälter der Gasdruck in dem Druckgasbehälter gemessen wird. Der oder die Druckgasbehälter sind vorzugsweise an einem Kraftfahrzeug oder Schienenfahrzeug angebracht, so daß die Herstellung des Gasgemisches Vorort erfolgen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 5/06; B01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/02 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01); F17C 5/06 (2006.01); F17C 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 15/0429 (2013.01); B01F 3/026 (2013.01); F17C 5/06 (2013.01); F17C 13/02 (2013.01); F17C 2201/054 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2265/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992732 A2 20000412; EP 0992732 A3 20060503; DE 19846288 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI