Global Patent Index - EP 0992733 A2

EP 0992733 A2 2000-04-12 - Production of gas mixtures in transportable pressurised gas containers

Title (en)

Production of gas mixtures in transportable pressurised gas containers

Title (de)

Herstellung von Gasgemischen mit transportablen Druckgasbehältern

Title (fr)

Préparation de mélanges de gaz avec des réservoirs transportables pour gaz sous pression

Publication

EP 0992733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116524 A

Priority

DE 19846287 A

Abstract (en)

Production of gas mixtures comprises directly producing the gas mixtures in pressurized gas containers of a gas cylinder truck or continuously producing the gas mixtures in a mixing apparatus connected to the pressurized gas containers of a gas cylinder truck and feeding into the pressurized gas container of the truck.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gasgemischen ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Gasgemisch in den Druckgasbehältern eines Druckgasflaschenwagens direkt hergestellt wird oder das Gasgemisch in einer den Druckgasbehältern eines Druckgasflaschenwagens vorgeschalteten Mischeinrichtung kontinuierlich hergestellt und in die Druckgasbehälter des Druckgasflaschenwagens geleitet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 5/06; B01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/02 (2006.01); F17C 5/06 (2006.01); F17C 13/02 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/026 (2013.01); F17C 5/06 (2013.01); F17C 13/02 (2013.01); B01F 13/0035 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0364 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0157 (2013.01); F17C 2250/032 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0421 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0447 (2013.01); F17C 2265/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992733 A2 20000412; EP 0992733 A3 20060503; DE 19846287 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061104

2007-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI