Global Patent Index - EP 0992734 A2

EP 0992734 A2 2000-04-12 - Compression of liquids and gas supply apparatus

Title (en)

Compression of liquids and gas supply apparatus

Title (de)

Verdichten von Flüssigkeiten und Gasversorgungsanlage

Title (fr)

Compression de liquides et installation d'alimentation en gaz

Publication

EP 0992734 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116241 A

Priority

DE 19839233 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839233A1] The cylinder can be operated with suction and pump strokes, sucking fluid into the cylinder and then pumping it out. The piston can be sealed against the cylinder wall by components containing polymer. Fluid is sucked into the cylinder by at least one suction valve formed as a check valve. The piston is driven in the cylinder hydraulically, pneumatically or by a crank drive.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft das Verdichten von Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere von verflüssigten Gasen, unter Einsatz eines Verdichters, welcher einen Zylinder und einen Kolben umfaßt. Das Verdichten von verflüssigten Gasen ist insbesondere im Zusammenhang mit einer Gasversorgungsanlage zur Bereitstellung von Hochdruckgas für einen Verbraucher von Bedeutung. Die Gasversorgungsanlage umfaßt einen Speicherbehälter zur Speicherung von verflüssigtem Gas, einen Verdampfer zum Verdampfen des verflüssigten Gases und den Verdichter mit Zylinder und Kolben zum Pumpen von verflüssigtem Gas. Erfindungsgemäß bewegt sich der Kolben im Zylinder mit einer Geschwindigkeit zwischen 1 und 250 mm/s. Der Zylinder kann mit einem Saug- und Pumptakt betrieben werden, wobei im Saugtakt Flüssigkeit in den Zylinder angesaugt und im Pumptakt aus dem Zylinder gepumpt wird. Der Kolben kann gegenüber der Zylinderwand mit polymere Bestandteile umfassenden Dichtmitteln abgedichtet sein. Die Erfindung eignet sich insbesondere für die Verdichtung von wie beispielsweise N2, Ar, O2 und CO2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 9/00; F04B 15/08; F04B 53/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F17C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2013.01); F04B 39/00 (2013.01); F17C 9/00 (2013.01); F04B 2201/0202 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0104 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0673 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0335 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/035 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0135 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0157 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839233 A1 20000302; EP 0992734 A2 20000412; EP 0992734 A3 20061213

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20080629

2007-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20070417

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI