Global patent index - EP 0992740 A1

EP 0992740 A1 2000-04-12 - Elastomeric sealing gasket for cooking ovens

Title (en)

Elastomeric sealing gasket for cooking ovens

Title (de)

Dichtung aus Elastomer für Backofen

Title (fr)

Joint d'étancheité en élastomère pour four de cuisson

Publication

EP 0992740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830589 A

Priority

EP 98830589 A

Abstract (en)

An elastomeric sealing gasket particularly for cooking ovens, to be placed between a front edge of the oven and the door of the oven itself, comprising a continuous strip (1), provided with metal elements (2, 2'), having respective hooks (21, 21') for engagement in respective holes provided in the oven structure, in which said metal hooking elements (2, 2') comprise a base (20) provided with transverse notches (22), which engages in a longitudinal cavity (3) of the strip (1), and is subsequently bent in the case of hooking elements (2) placed at the corners of the gasket (10, 100, 200). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/021 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992740 A1 20000412; EP 0992740 B1 20020109; DE 69803455 D1 20020228; DE 69803455 T2 20030508; ES 2170468 T3 20020801

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041008

2005-10-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041008

2003-10-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030929

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2170468

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69803455

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-28

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI