Global Patent Index - EP 0992751 A2

EP 0992751 A2 2000-04-12 - Drawer for refrigerators or freezers

Title (en)

Drawer for refrigerators or freezers

Title (de)

Schubladen für Kühl- bzw. Gefrierschränke

Title (fr)

Tiroir pour réfrigérateurs ou congélateurs

Publication

EP 0992751 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111661 A

Priority

DE 29817497 U

Abstract (en)

The sliding drawer (12.14), for refrigerators and deep freeze appliances (10), is a plastics shell with a back wall and/or front wall (18,18') and side walls at least partially of a multi-layer or hollow chamber profile, together with a base. The upper edge, round the sliding drawer, is formed as a multi-layer or hollow chamber profile. The whole of the front wall (18,18'), towards the appliance door (16), is pref. a multi-layer structure or a hollow chamber.

Abstract (de)

Schublade (12,14) für Kühl- oder Gefrierschränke bestehend aus einer Kunststoffschale mit einem Boden, einer Hinterwand, einer Vorderwand (18,18') und zwei Seitenwänden (22), wobei die Seitenwände (22), die Rückwand und/oder die Vorderwand zumindest teilweise als Mehrschicht- oder Hohlkammerprofil (20) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 88/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817497 U1 19990218; EP 0992751 A2 20000412; EP 0992751 A3 20010131; EP 0992751 B1 20030820; ES 2207074 T3 20040516

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906654

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110704

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070617

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070616

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060609

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207074 T3

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906654 P 20030925

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIEBHERR-HAUSGERAETE OCHSENHAUSEN GMBH

2002-12-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REFRIGERATOR OR FREEZER WITH DRAWERS

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25D 25/02 A, 7A 47B 88/04 B, 7A 47B 88/00 B

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI