Global patent index - EP 0992752 A1

EP 0992752 A1 2000-04-12 - Apparatus for drying substantially ellipsoid products, such as for instance eggs

Title (en)

Apparatus for drying substantially ellipsoid products, such as for instance eggs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Trocknung von im wesentlichen elliptischen Produkten, wie z.B. Eier

Title (fr)

Dispositif de séchage de produits sensiblement elliptiques, comme par exemple des oeufs

Publication

EP 0992752 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202627 A

Priority

  • NL 1010286 A
  • NL 1011560 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for drying substantially ellipsoid products, such as, for instance, eggs (E), which are conveyed over a conveying path (L) by means of a conveyor (1), the apparatus comprising a number of nozzles (2,3) which are connected to a compressor, the nozzles (2,3) being designed and arranged relative to the conveying path (L), such that the drying air blown out by these nozzles (2,3) has a main flow direction (D) which is both directed substantially perpendicularly to the surface (S) of a passing product (E) and blows directly onto at least the areas adjacent the points (P) of a passing product (E). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 15/12; F26B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 15/12 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/004 (2013.01); F26B 15/122 (2013.01); F26B 2210/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992752 A1 20000412; EP 0992752 B1 20040107; DK 0992752 T3 20040413; NL 1011560 C1 20000411

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-04-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK IT NL

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020419

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DK IT NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DK IT NL

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI