Global patent index - EP 0992757 A2

EP 0992757 A2 2000-04-12 - Header tube for heat exchanger

Title (en)

Header tube for heat exchanger

Title (de)

Sammelrohreinheit für einen Wärmeübertrager

Title (fr)

Tube collecteur pour échangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0992757 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118012 A

Priority

DE 19846267 A

Abstract (en)

The collection tube (1) is produced from one or more face-side individual tubes inserted one in the other or joined together, with an open longitudinal slot (2) at least on one individual tube face side (1b) formed before or after construction of the collection tube. The collection tube contains several flow-pressed individual tubes with closed face-side bases, which with their bases are joined together and provided with through longitudinal slots.

Abstract (de)

2.1. Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Sammelrohreinheit für einen Wärmeübertrager mit einem Rohrblock aus mehreren Wärmeübertragerrohren, wobei sie ein Sammelrohr beinhaltet, in dessen Rohrwand ein gemeinsamer Längsschlitz für darin einzufügende Enden der Wärmeübertragerrohre eingebracht ist. 2.2. Erfindungsgemäß ist das Sammelrohr aus einem oder mehreren stirnseitig ineinandergesteckten oder aneinandergefügten Einzelrohren mit jeweils wenigstens an einer Einzelrohrstirnseite (1b) offenem, vor oder nach dem Aufbau des Sammelrohres eingebrachtem Längsschlitz (2) gefertigt. Dies ermöglicht einen problemlosen Ausgleich von Fertigungstoleranzen der in den Längsschlitz einzufügenden Rohrenden bezüglich deren Ausdehnung in Richtung des Längsschlitzes. 2.3. Verwendung z.B. für Gaskühler und Verdampfer von CO2-Klimaanlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/18 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0243 (2013.01); F28D 1/05366 (2013.01); F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0073 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0085 (2013.01); F28F 2220/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 845647 C 19520804 - TITTELBACH FRITZ DIPL-ING

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992757 A2 20000412; EP 0992757 A3 20000621; EP 0992757 B1 20030723; AU 1373100 A 20000501; CA 2312784 A1 20000420; DE 19846267 A1 20000413; ES 2204041 T3 20040416; JP 2000111295 A 20000418; JP 4210007 B2 20090114; US 6170569 B1 20010109; WO 0022365 A2 20000420; WO 0022365 A3 20000713

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906340

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080921

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080920

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080920

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204041

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906340

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI