Global Patent Index - EP 0992789 A1

EP 0992789 A1 2000-04-12 - System and method for optically testing the quality of tube outer surface

Title (en)

System and method for optically testing the quality of tube outer surface

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren zur optischen Qualitätsprüfung einer Rohraussenoberfläche

Title (fr)

Système et procédé optique pour contrôler la qualité de la surface externe d'un tube

Publication

EP 0992789 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250305 A

Priority

DE 19843208 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has at least one optical camera unit (3) directed at the pipe's surface (5) and mounted on a rotation frame (2). This rotates equidistantly about the pipe (1) under test whilst a transport arrangement moves the pipe along. The resulting helical acquisition region (8) is fed from the camera unit to a data processor (10) as an image sequence. The data processor detects surface defect points and evaluates them for relevance

Abstract (de)

Um bei einer Einrichtung zur optischen Qualitätsprüfung einer Rohraußenoberfläche, insbesondere hinsichtlich Längsriefen und sonstigen Oberflächenfehlern, wie Schalen und Kratzer, eine schnelle und zuverlässige Prüfung zu gewährleisten, wird vorgeschlagen, daß mindestens eine optisch auf die Rohraußenoberfläche (5) ausgerichtete und an einem Rotationsgestell (2) befestigte Kameraeinheit (3) äquidistant um das zu prüfende Rohr (1) rotiert und gleichzeitig eine Rohrtransporteinrichtung das Rohr (1) längs transportiert, wobei der dabei entstehende schraubenlinienförmige Aufnahmebereich (8) der Kameraeinheit (3) als Bildsequenz einer nachgeschalteten Datenverarbeitungseinrichtung (10) zugeht, die Fehlerstellen auf der Rohraußenoberfläche (5) erkennt und hinsichtlich der Relevanz auswertet. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer deratigen Einrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992789 A1 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-07-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANNROEHREN-WERKE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041022

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI