Global Patent Index - EP 0992877 A3

EP 0992877 A3 2000-07-19 - Information processing apparatus

Title (en)

Information processing apparatus

Title (de)

Informationsverarbeitungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement d'information

Publication

EP 0992877 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00100830 A

Priority

  • EP 93116992 A
  • JP 28327392 A
  • JP 28327692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0598236A1] An information processing apparatus obtains a distance that an input pen is moved as the number of dots on a screen, and judges whether a pen stroke is a gesture entry or a pointing entry according to the number of the dots. More specifically, when the input pen is moved over less than nine dots, the gesture mode is set to G-PENUP. When the input pen is moved over less than nine dots, whether it is moved over more than eight dots or not is judged. If the input pen is moved over more than eight dots, the input pen is judged to be lifted up and a cursor is moved. On the other hand, if the input pen is moved over more than eight dots, gesture recognition processing is performed and whether the gesture is recognized or not is judged. If it is recognized, a recognized gesture command and a feature point of the gesture command are fetched into RAM. As described above, the information processing apparatus judges whether an input made by the input pen is a gesture entry or a pointing entry according to the number of dots over which the input pen is moved. Therefore, a switch is not required to change entry modes, achieving a reduction in cost and improved handling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 3/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/0481 (2013.01); G06F 3/0488 (2013.01); G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G06K 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/04883 (2013.01); G06F 3/0481 (2013.01); G06F 3/16 (2013.01); G06K 9/00409 (2013.01); G06K 9/00429 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9208183 A1 19920514 - GO CORP [US]
  • [A] EP 0243925 A2 19871104 - CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] ROBERTSON G G ET AL: "BUTTONS AS FIRST CLASS OBJECTS ON AN X DESKTOP", ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY,US,NEW YORK, NY: ACM, 1991, pages 35 - 44, XP000315064

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0598236 A1 19940525; EP 0598236 B1 20010110; DE 69329846 D1 20010215; DE 69329846 T2 20010523; DE 69332727 D1 20030403; DE 69332727 T2 20031016; EP 0992877 A2 20000412; EP 0992877 A3 20000719; EP 0992877 B1 20030226; US 5481278 A 19960102; US 5796406 A 19980818

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131019

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-11-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20131019

2013-10-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69332727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69332727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0598236

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SHIGEMATSU, HIROYUKI

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, YUTAKA

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAKAMOTO, MUNENORI

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAGASAWA, HIROYUKI

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAO, HIROSHI

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAJIMA, YASUHIRO

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KURATA, MASAAKI

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020506

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-04-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 598236

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB