Global Patent Index - EP 0992892 A1

EP 0992892 A1 2000-04-12 - Compound memory access instructions

Title (en)

Compound memory access instructions

Title (de)

Verbundspeicherzugriffsbefehle

Title (fr)

Instructions d'accès de mémoire composées

Publication

EP 0992892 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98402456 A

Priority

EP 98402456 A

Abstract (en)

A processing engine 10 includes an instruction buffer 502 operable to buffer single and compound instructions pending execution. A decode mechanism is configured to decode instructions from the instruction buffer. The decode mechanism is arranged to respond to a predetermined tag in a tag field of an instruction, which predetermined tag is representative of the instruction being a compound instruction formed from separate programmed memory instructions. The decode mechanism is operable in response to the predetermined tag to decode at least first data flow control for a first programmed instruction and second data flow control for a second programmed instruction. The use of compound instructions enables effective use of the bandwidth available within the processing engine. A soft dual memory instruction can be compiled from separate first and second programmed memory instructions. A compound address field of the predetermined compound instruction can be arranged at the same bit positions as the address field for a hard compound memory instruction, that is a compound instruction which is programmed. In this case the decoding of the addresses can be started before the operation code of the instructions have been decoded. To reduce the number of bits in the compound instruction, addressing can be restricted to indirect addressing and the operation codes for at least the first instruction can be reduced in size. In this way, the compound instruction can be arranged to have the same number of bits in total as the sum of the bits of the separate programmed instructions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/38; G06F 9/45

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01); G06F 9/45 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/3822 (2013.01); G06F 9/3017 (2013.01); G06F 9/3853 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992892 A1 20000412; EP 0992892 B1 20151202; JP 2000215061 A 20000804

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69843478

2016-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-09-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69843478

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-01-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69843478

2015-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2015-12-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-06-03 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150506

2015-06-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CATAN, HERVE

2015-06-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DJAFARIAN, KARIM

2015-06-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAURENTI, GILBERT

2015-06-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GILLET, VINCENT

2008-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080108

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI