Global patent index - EP 0992902 A2

EP 0992902 A2 2000-04-12 - Dual interrupt vector mapping

Title (en)

Dual interrupt vector mapping

Title (de)

Doppelte Unterbrechungsvektorabbildung

Title (fr)

Représentation duale de vecteurs d'interruption

Publication

EP 0992902 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99400550 A

Priority

  • EP 99400550 A
  • EP 98402455 A
  • US 41118799 A

Abstract (en)

A processor (100) is provided that is a programmable digital signal processor (DSP) with variable instruction length, offering both high code density and easy programming. Architecture and instruction set are optimized for low power consumption and high efficiency execution of DSP algorithms, such as for wireless telephones, as well as pure control tasks. Two sets of interrupt vectors are maintained. Interrupts vectors pertaining to interrupts originated by one set of interrupt sources (820, 821, 822) are stored in a DSP interrupt vector table (850) located in a memory circuit 801 that is private to the DSP. Interrupt vectors pertaining to interrupts originated by a host processor (810) are stored in a Host interrupt vector table (851) located in a dual ported communication memory circuit (802). The DSP executes interrupt service routines to service all of the interrupts, but the host can change the interrupt vectors for host initiated interrupts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/46; G06F 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 5/01 (2006.01); G06F 7/60 (2006.01); G06F 7/74 (2006.01); G06F 7/76 (2006.01); G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 9/315 (2006.01); G06F 9/318 (2006.01); G06F 9/32 (2006.01); G06F 9/355 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01); H04M 1/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/764 (2013.01); G06F 5/01 (2013.01); G06F 7/607 (2013.01); G06F 7/74 (2013.01); G06F 7/762 (2013.01); G06F 9/30032 (2013.01); G06F 9/3005 (2013.01); G06F 9/30149 (2013.01); G06F 9/30181 (2013.01); G06F 9/32 (2013.01); G06F 9/321 (2013.01); G06F 9/327 (2013.01); G06F 9/34 (2013.01); G06F 9/3552 (2013.01); G06F 9/3816 (2013.01); G06F 9/3836 (2013.01); G06F 9/3838 (2013.01); G06F 9/384 (2013.01); G06F 9/3857 (2013.01); G06F 9/3867 (2013.01); G06F 9/3879 (2013.01); G06F 9/3885 (2013.01); G06F 9/3891 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992902 A2 20000412; EP 0992902 A3 20031022

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 9/46 A

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/24 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI