Global patent index - EP 0992945 A2

EP 0992945 A2 2000-04-12 - Video game apparatus, model display and readable recording medium therefor

Title (en)

Video game apparatus, model display and readable recording medium therefor

Title (de)

Videospielgerät, Modellanzeige und lesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium dafür

Title (fr)

Appareil de jeu video, affichage de modèle et support d'enregistrement lisible

Publication

EP 0992945 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119171 A

Priority

JP 28712698 A

Abstract (en)

In a video game system (1), model data and a plurality of arrangement-data groups formed of model numbers, position data, rotation-angle data, and scale data are recorded into a recording medium (5). Operation detection means (50) detects an operation on a controller (16). Viewpoint movement means (61) moves the viewpoint, and field-of-view determination means (62) determines a model included in the field of view. Instruction control means (63) outputs the arrangement-data group corresponding to this model. An image processing processor (12) converts the coordinate data of each vertex of a plurality of polygons constituting the corresponding model at the position indicated by the position data sent from the instruction control means (63), according to the rotation-angle data and the scale data, and assigns the texture specified by each texture instruction data to each polygon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/00 (2006.01); A63F 13/06 (2006.01); A63F 13/10 (2006.01); G06T 19/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 13/52 (2013.01); A63F 13/10 (2013.01); A63F 13/60 (2014.09); A63F 13/95 (2014.09); G06T 15/20 (2013.01); A63F 2300/207 (2013.01); A63F 2300/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992945 A2 20000412; EP 0992945 A3 20000503; EP 0992945 B1 20070718; DE 69936562 D1 20070830; DE 69936562 T2 20080430; JP 2000113226 A 20000421; JP 3001538 B1 20000124; US 6390918 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131006

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69936562

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131006

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-12-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2009-12-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-12-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2008-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-05-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026045

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69936562

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-08-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040513

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI