Global Patent Index - EP 0992947 A2

EP 0992947 A2 2000-04-12 - Apparatus and method for the storing of data concerning the usage of an end-user device

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for the storing of data concerning the usage of an end-user device

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Speicherung von Daten über eine Benutzung eines Endgerätes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de stockage de données d'utilisation d'un appareil par un utilisateur

Publication

EP 0992947 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250331 A

Priority

DE 19847951 A

Abstract (en)

A non-volatile usage-memory (16) stores previous usage data and is connected to a microprocessor (6). The microprocessor is programmed in a storage mode for storing usage data corresponding to previous usage, and enters a communication mode in which data are transmitted from the usage memory to a remote store (31). The data transmission allows a statistical evaluation of the usage data. The microprocessor is programmed to re-initialize the usage memory in order to restore its predefined capacity after data transmission. A method of storing data relating to the usage of a terminal is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Speicherung von Daten über eine Benutzung eines Endgerätes, wobei ein Benutzungsspeicher (16) für gespeicherte Benutzungsdaten mit dem Mikroprozessor (6) verbunden ist, welcher programmiert ist: zum Vergleich aktueller Benutzungsdaten mit den bereits abgespeicherten Benutzungsdaten, Zur Abspeicherung eines neuen Datensatzes mit Benutzungsdaten im Benutzungsspeicher in historischer Reihenfolge entsprechend der Benutzung, wenn diese Benutzungsdaten gegenüber den im vorangehend abgespeicherten Datensatz gespeicherten Benutzungsdaten verändert oder ungleichartig sind, zur Bildung eines Zählers für Benutzungsdaten, zur Inkrementierung des Zählers und Ersetzen entsprechender Daten eines bereits abgespeicherten Datensatzes durch neue Daten, welche den inkrementierten Zählerstand wiederspiegeln, wenn die aktuellen Benutzungsdaten gegenüber dem bereits abgespeicherten Datensatz unverändert oder gleich sind, sowie, zur Datenübertragung vom Benutzungsspeicher (16) zu einem entfernten Speicher (31) zwecks Auswertung der Benutzungsdaten und zur Neuinitialisierung des Benutzungsspeichers (16) zwecks Wiederherstellung einer vorbestimmten Speicherkapazität im Benutzungsspeicher (16) nachdem die Datenübertragung erfolgt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00241 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00427 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992947 A2 20000412; EP 0992947 A3 20001213; EP 0992947 B1 20060607; AU 5356099 A 20000413; AU 754215 B2 20021107; CN 1154936 C 20040623; CN 1281199 A 20010124; DE 19847951 A1 20000420; DE 59913511 D1 20060720; NO 319846 B1 20050919; NO 994891 A 20000410; NO 994891 D0 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 59913511

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-05-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59913511

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130319

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913511 P 20060720

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI