Global Patent Index - EP 0992963 A2

EP 0992963 A2 2000-04-12 - Method for signalling status information relative to the traffic

Title (en)

Method for signalling status information relative to the traffic

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Signalisierung verkehrsrelevanter Zustandsinformationen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour signaliser des informations d'état relatives au trafic

Publication

EP 0992963 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99440267 A

Priority

DE 19846469 A

Abstract (en)

Existing terminals such as mobile telephones, audio devices, computers etc. are used to provide audible and/or visual and/or mechanical signaling, the usual function of the terminal being suppressed during the signaling. An Independent claim is included for a system to carry out the above method which includes a processing and control unit (2) connected to a device for detecting status information. Status information may be transmitted to a central office such as a weather service or disaster relief service. A loudspeaker (4x), display (4y) and/or vibrator (4z) are used to alert the road user. The detecting device (1) may be sensor for acoustic, optical, environmental, engine function and/or body function (heart rate) signals. The terminal is preferably a mobile telephone.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Signalisierung verkehrsrelevanter Zustandsinformationen (5), insbesondere Warnsignale, an Verkehrsteilnehmer. Um Warnsignale einfach und sicher an Verkehrsteilnehmer zu übermitteln, wenn diese durch Endgeräte abgelenkt sind, ist vorgesehen, daß die Endgeräte, insbesondere Mobiltelefon, Phonogerät, Computer, zur akustischen und/oder optischen und/oder mechanischen Signalisierung verwendet werden, wobei die übliche Funktion des Endgerätes währenddessen unterdrückt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992963 A2 20000412; EP 0992963 A3 20000830

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI