Global Patent Index - EP 0992972 A2

EP 0992972 A2 2000-04-12 - Method of adjusting the light intensity of a cell of a flat panel display

Title (en)

Method of adjusting the light intensity of a cell of a flat panel display

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung der Helligkeit einer Zelle eines Flachdisplays

Title (fr)

Methode de commande de l'intensité lumineuse d'une cellule d'un écran d'affichage plat

Publication

EP 0992972 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119311 A

Priority

DE 19845187 A

Abstract (en)

The brightness of the cell is variable by a time-based controller. The brightness setting is not varied linearly, but is higher in darker regions than brighter regions, taking account of the subjective brightness sensitivity of the eye, and remains below a defined maximum. A linearly variable brightness setting is converted into nonlinear values by a processor based on function coefficients, and these values are added to a digital or analog video signal. The video output signal is fed to a cell control circuit. A circuit is also claimed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Einstellung der Helligkeit einer Zelle eines Flachdisplays, die durch zeitliche Ansteuerung veränderbar ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß unter Berücksichtigung des subjektiven Helligkeitsempfindens die Helligkeitseinstellgröße nicht linear verändert wird, und zwar in der Weise, daß sie im dunkleren Bereich höher ist als im helleren Bereich und unterhalb eines definierten Maximalwertes liegt, und eine Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/20; G09G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2013.01); G09G 5/10 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0238 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0626 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992972 A2 20000412; EP 0992972 A3 20001025; DE 19845187 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020126

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001014

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI