Global patent index - EP 0992976 A2

EP 0992976 A2 2000-04-12 - Motor vehicle comprising a device for electro-acoustic sound feedback

Title (en)

Motor vehicle comprising a device for electro-acoustic sound feedback

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Vorrichtung zur elektroakustischen Geräuschrückführung

Title (fr)

Véhicule automobile avec un dispositif pour la boucle de contre-réaction électro-acoustique du son

Publication

EP 0992976 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116192 A

Priority

DE 19845736 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a sound pressure sensor (12). A signal processing unit (14) is connected to the sound pressure sensor to receive and processes signals from the sensor. A loudspeaker unit (16), with at least one loudspeaker, is connected to the signal processing unit. The sound pressure sensor is mounted in the vehicle's induction or exhaust tract. Preferably the vehicle's audio system acts as the loudspeaker unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur elektroakustischen Geräuschrückführung für ein Kraftfahrzeug (10) mit einem Schalldrucksensor (12), einer Signalverarbeitungseinheit (14), welche mit dem Schalldrucksensor (12) verbunden ist und Signale vom diesem erhält und verarbeitet, und einer Lautsprechereinheit (16) mit zumindest einem Lautsprecher, welche mit der Signalverarbeitungseinheit (14) verbunden ist. Die Aufgabe, das Motorgeräusch möglichst natürlich und einfach in den Innenraum des Kraftfahrzeugs zu übertragen, wird dadurch gelöst, daß der Schalldrucksensor (12) im Ansaug- (18) oder Abgastrakt des Kraftfahrzeuges (10) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/178; G10K 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/178 (2006.01); G10K 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/1782 (2013.01); G10K 15/02 (2013.01); G10K 2210/106 (2013.01); G10K 2210/1282 (2013.01); G10K 2210/3027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845736 A1 20000406; DE 59912822 D1 20051229; EP 0992976 A2 20000412; EP 0992976 A3 20021204; EP 0992976 B1 20051123

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912822

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A DEVICE FOR ELECTRO-ACOUSTIC SOUND FEEDBACK

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10K 15/02 A

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI