Global patent index - EP 0993006 A2

EP 0993006 A2 2000-04-12 - Material and its manufacturing process

Title (en)

Material and its manufacturing process

Title (de)

Werkstoff und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben

Title (fr)

Matériau et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0993006 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118734 A

Priority

DE 19845411 A

Abstract (en)

An electrically insulating material comprises a molded resin (5) with a carbon black-containing portion for forming a conductive region (4) extending between a selected pair of spaced electrical connection regions, while leaving an insulating region between one of these selected connection regions and a non-selected connection region. An Independent claim is also included for production of the above electrically insulating material by (a) mixing a molding resin (5) with carbon black; (b) pouring the resin into a mould having several electrodes; and (c) passing a d.c. voltage between two of the electrodes, during curing of the resin, so that a conductive region (4) is formed between the selected electrodes, while the material remains insulating between one of these selected electrodes and a further electrode.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen elektrisch isolierenden Werkstoff, bei dem mindestens ein erster elektrischer Anschlußbereich, mindestens ein zweiter elektrischer Anschlußbereich und mindestens ein weiterer elektrischer Anschlußbereich vorgesehen sind, welche genannten elektrischen Anschlußbereiche voneinander beabstandet sind, wobei der Werkstoff Gießharz aufweist und zumindest partiell mit Ruß versetzt ist, so daß mindestens ein zumindest partiell elektrisch längs mindestens einer vorgebbaren Richtung leitend einstellbarer Bereich zwischen zwei ausgewählten der genannten elektrischen Anschlußbereiche gebildet ist, wobei zwischen mindestens einem der zwei ausgewählten elektrischen Anschlußbereiche und dem nicht ausgewählten elektrischen Anschlußbereich der Werkstoff elektrisch isolierend ist. Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines derartigen Werkstoffs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 17/28 (2006.01); H01B 5/16 (2006.01); H01B 13/00 (2006.01); H01C 7/00 (2006.01); H01T 19/04 (2006.01); H01T 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/005 (2013.01); H01T 19/04 (2013.01); H01T 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845411 A1 20000406; EP 0993006 A2 20000412; EP 0993006 A3 20020206; JP 2000123640 A 20000428

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01C 13/00 A, 7H 01C 7/02 B, 7H 01C 17/26 B

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNOPF, FRANZ

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PRASSE, TORSTEN

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FLANDIN, LIONEL

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI