Global Patent Index - EP 0993012 A1

EP 0993012 A1 2000-04-12 - Closing resistor assembly for high voltage apparatus

Title (en)

Closing resistor assembly for high voltage apparatus

Title (de)

Einbau des Einschaltwiderstandes für Hochspannungsanlage

Title (fr)

Montage de résistance d'une fermeture pour appareillage à haute tension.

Publication

EP 0993012 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402377 A

Priority

FR 9812621 A

Abstract (en)

The enclosed resistance mounting has multiple stacked resistance sections (1) aligned on an axis (D) and an applied compression force. The compression force is applied to an outer rigid tube (2) with the stacked resistor floating internally and a central piece (9). A spring force (12) is applied from a fixed section (1) on the outer enclosure wall. The tubular resistive section is held between two positions by an end stop (14) on the moving section and static tube section.

Abstract (fr)

Le montage de résistance de fermeture pour un appareillage électrique à haute tension, comprend un multiplicité de composants résistants électriques (1) alignés en une rangée le long d'un axe (D), et un moyen pour exercer sur les composants électriques une force de compression dirigée selon l'axe pour maintenir le contact électrique entre eux. Le moyen pour exercer ladite force de compression comprend un tube rigide (2) à l'intérieur duquel sont empilés lesdits composants électriques et une structure flottante à accumulation d'énergie disposée dans le tube à une extrémité de la rangée de composants électrique, cette structure flottante étant constituée d'une première pièce (9) disposée entre ladite extrémité de la rangée de composants électriques et une seconde pièce (11) montée fixe dans le tube et d'un ressort maintenu en compression entre la première et la seconde pièce, ladite première pièce étant en outre montée semi-mobile entre deux butées espacées suivant l'axe D. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/16 (2013.01); H01H 33/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993012 A1 20000412; EP 0993012 B1 20061227; CA 2286416 A1 20000409; CA 2286416 C 20061212; DE 69934559 D1 20070208; DE 69934559 T2 20071004; FR 2784500 A1 20000414; FR 2784500 B1 20001110; US 6201204 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D SA, FR

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM GRID SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69934559

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-06-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69934559

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69934559

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2012-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934559

- Representative's name: ZEITLER VOLPERT KANDLBINDER, DE

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-04-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69934559 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI SE

2006-12-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK LI SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI