Global patent index - EP 0993067 A3

EP 0993067 A3 2000-08-23 - Windowpane antenna apparatus for vehicles

Title (en)

Windowpane antenna apparatus for vehicles

Title (de)

Auf eine Fahrzeugscheibe montierte Antennenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'antenne pour montage sur la fenêtre d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 0993067 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99307317 A

Priority

JP 28287098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0993067A2] A windowpane antenna apparatus for vehicles according to the present invention includes a defogger (10) mounted on a window (100) of a vehicle, for defogging the window (100), means for causing the defogger (10) to serve as a slot antenna (SA), and a driven antenna (20) arranged close and opposite to the defogger (10) with a given gap (Gm) therebetween in such a manner that one side (20a) of the driven antenna (20) is mutually coupled to one side (10a) of the defogger (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/15 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01); H01Q 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/10 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1278 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993067 A2 20000412; EP 0993067 A3 20000823; JP 2000114839 A 20000421; US 6211832 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030815

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030404

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ENDO, HIROSHI

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WAKUI, AKIRA

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HASHIMOTO, MICHIHIKO

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAITOH, MASATOSHI

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AHRABIAN, MAHMOOD

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI