Global Patent Index - EP 0993069 A2

EP 0993069 A2 2000-04-12 - Surface mount circularly polarized wave antenna and communication apparatus using the same

Title (en)

Surface mount circularly polarized wave antenna and communication apparatus using the same

Title (de)

Oberflächenmontierte zirkularpolarisierte Antenne und Kommunikationsgerät mit einer derartigen Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne à polarisation circulaire montable en surface et appareil de communication utilisant celle-ci

Publication

EP 0993069 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113097 A

Priority

  • JP 28265698 A
  • JP 32502898 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a surface mount circularly polarized wave antenna (10) which includes a substrate (11) made of an insulation material and having a first main face, a second main face, and at least one side face elongating between the first main face and the second main face; a first ground electrode (12) disposed mainly on the first main face of the substrate; a radiation electrode (13) disposed mainly on the second main face; a feeding electrode (14) having a strip shape and so disposed as to elongate from the first main face side of the substrate, on one side face of the substrate, and toward the second main face side, one edge of the feeding electrode being positioned near to one side of the radiation electrode (13); a second ground electrode (15) disposed substantially on the whole of the side face of the substrate where the feeding electrode (14) is disposed, and in insulation from the feeding electrode (14) and in connection to the first ground electrode (12); and a degeneracy separation means (13a) provided in relation to the radiation electrode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/38; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/26 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0428 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0767510 A1 19970409 - MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993069 A2 20000412; EP 0993069 A3 20010425; CA 2273715 A1 20000405; CA 2273715 C 20010508; CN 1135654 C 20040121; CN 1250233 A 20000412; JP 2000183637 A 20000630; JP 3252812 B2 20020204; KR 100309160 B1 20011107; KR 20000028689 A 20000525; US 6140968 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110201

2008-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080508

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990706

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI