Global Patent Index - EP 0993073 A1

EP 0993073 A1 2000-04-12 - Panel of active antennas with multilayer structure

Title (en)

Panel of active antennas with multilayer structure

Title (de)

Platte mit aktiven Antennen mit einer Mehrschichtstruktur

Title (fr)

Panneau d'antenne active à structure multicouches

Publication

EP 0993073 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402322 A

Priority

FR 9812457 A

Abstract (en)

The active panel antenna has a number of radiating elements (3) and a multibeam radiating structure (6) together with connection layers (8a,8b). The radiating structure is perpendicular to the antenna plane and the connection and radiating structure are moulded so that the separator forms a single block.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un panneau d'antenne active (1) comportant un réseau (2) de n éléments rayonnants et un répartiteur (3) de m faisceaux à structure multicouches destiné à alimenter les n éléments rayonnants (2i), le répartiteur comportant des premières couches dites de formation (6) destinées à supporter des moyens de formation des faisceaux, et des deuxièmes couches dites de connexion (8a, 8b) destinées à supporter des premiers moyens de connexion électriques des premières couches entre elles et des seconds moyens de connexion électriques aux éléments rayonnants. Selon l'invention les couches de formation s'étendent sensiblement perpendiculairement au plan principal de l'antenne, les couches de formation et les couches de connexion sont assemblées par moulage de telle sorte que le répartiteur de faisceaux constitue un monobloc et les éléments rayonnants sont connectés directement aux seconds moyens de connexion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/00; H01Q 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/28 (2006.01); H01Q 3/40 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01); H01Q 21/22 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/22 (2013.01); H01Q 3/40 (2013.01); H01Q 21/0087 (2013.01); H01Q 21/0093 (2013.01); H01Q 21/065 (2013.01); H01Q 23/00 (2013.01); H01Q 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0620613 A2 19941019 - HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]
  • [A] US 5471220 A 19951128 - HAMMERS DAVID E [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0398555 A2 19901122 - HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]
  • [X] ULIAN P ET AL: "3D ACTIVE MODULES FOR HIGH INTEGRATION ANTENNAS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE WEEK, INCLUDING 28TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, vol. 1, 5 October 1998 (1998-10-05) - 6 October 1998 (1998-10-06), AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS, pages 271 - 276, XP002106338
  • [Y] COROMINA F ET AL: "NEW MULTIBEAM BEAMFORMING NETWORKS FOR PHASED ARRAY ANTENNAS USING ADVANCED MMCM TECHNOLOGY", 1996 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, SAN FRANCISCO, JUNE 17 - 21, 1996, vol. 1, 17 June 1996 (1996-06-17), RANSON R G (ED ), pages 79 - 82, XP000704868
  • [Y] MONFRAIX P ET AL: "3D MICROWAVE MODULES FOR SPACE APPLICATIONS", 1998 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, vol. 3, 7 June 1998 (1998-06-07) - 12 June 1998 (1998-06-12), Baltimore, USA, pages 1289 - 1292, XP002106340

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993073 A1 20000412; EP 0993073 B1 20060503; AT 325442 T 20060615; DE 69931119 D1 20060608; DE 69931119 T2 20061130; ES 2264248 T3 20061216; FR 2784237 A1 20000407; FR 2784237 B1 20031003; JP 2000114867 A 20000421; JP 4185222 B2 20081126; US 6188361 B1 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150521

2015-07-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150521

2014-11-28 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-22 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140717

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060923

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060804

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALCATEL

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-08-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-07-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

- Effective date: 20070502

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALCATEL LUCENT

2006-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2264248 T3

2006-10-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-08-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-06-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931119 P 20060608

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041207

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI