Global patent index - EP 0993075 A3

EP 0993075 A3 2001-03-21 - Electrical connector with metallic jacket

Title (en)

Electrical connector with metallic jacket

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder mit einer Metallhülse

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique avec un manchon métallique

Publication

EP 0993075 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99650090 A

Priority

JP 29625198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0993075A2] An electrical connector with a metallic jacket comprises a contact element (1) to be connected to a cable (C), a tubular support (4) for supporting the contact element (1), a metallic jacket (14) fitted over the tubular support (4) and having at least one slit (18) extending rearwardly from the front opening, a stopper projection (7) provided on the tubular support (4), and a stopper portion (19) provided in the metallic jacket (14) at the rear end of the slit (18) for engagement with the stopper projection (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0518 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993075 A2 20000412; EP 0993075 A3 20010321; JP 2000113946 A 20000421

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI