Global Patent Index - EP 0993084 A1

EP 0993084 A1 2000-04-12 - Mehrstufige elektrische Steckdose

Title (en)

Mehrstufige elektrische Steckdose

Title (de)

Extendable electrical receptacle

Title (fr)

Prise électrique gigogne

Publication

EP 0993084 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402466 A

Priority

FR 9812545 A

Abstract (en)

The secondary plug connection mechanism has two mains connecting pins (4) and a socket (3) pin receptacle. There is a side connecting cable, and a second set of internal sockets (6), and protruding pin (7) for connection of a second plug. The upper pin is protected by a cover (2).

Abstract (fr)

Prise électrique comportant une partie mâle et une partie femelle, qui reliée à un appareil électrique permet d'en connecter un second sans avoir à utiliser d'accessoires annexes du type multiprise, comportant un corps cylindrique plein (1) dont la partie inférieure, dite mâle, est munie de deux broches (4) et d'une douille (3) et dont la partie supérieure, dite femelle, est munie de deux douilles (6) et d'une broche (7), un câble électrique relié à un appareil électrique, la douille (3) et les broches (4) étant connectées au câble (5), la douille (3) et la broche (7) étant connectées entre elles et les broches (4) et les douilles (6) étant connectées entre elles une à une. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/00; H01R 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/003 (2013.01); H01R 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993084 A1 20000412; FR 2784512 A1 20000414; FR 2784512 B1 20010119

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI