Global patent index - EP 0993085 A2

EP 0993085 A2 2000-04-12 - Electric wire grasping clamp

Title (en)

Electric wire grasping clamp

Title (de)

Greifzange für elektrische Kabel

Title (fr)

Pince de préhension de fils électriques

Publication

EP 0993085 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119910 A

Priority

JP 28843498 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a support block; one pair of grasping blocks which have sandwich faces for sandwiching an electric wire (W) between in a predetermined position and which are supported by the support block so as to be freely rotatable between the position for sandwiching the electric wire and at least a horizontal position; and grasping concave portions which are provided in the sandwich faces, and each of which has two contact faces coming into contact with outer periphery of the electric wire. An angle formed between one contact face located on a rotation center side in the grasping block when the grasping block is in a horizontal position state and a perpendicular line is set so as to be larger than an angle formed between the other contact face and the perpendicular line, and consequently the electric wire is located so as to have same axis height irrespective of a diameter of the electric wire. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/012 (2006.01); H01R 43/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993085 A2 20000412; EP 0993085 A3 20010620; EP 0993085 B1 20071226; JP 2000123661 A 20000428; JP 3568797 B2 20040922

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061211

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAZAKI CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061211

2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH LI

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI