Global Patent Index - EP 0993232 A2

EP 0993232 A2 2000-04-12 - Device for amelioration of the quality of hearing

Title (en)

Device for amelioration of the quality of hearing

Title (de)

Gerät zur Verbesserung der Qualität des Gehörs

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'amelioration de la qualité de l'ouie

Publication

EP 0993232 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99600013 A

Priority

GR 98100360 A

Abstract (en)

This is referred to patients with partial or total loss of hearing of the one ear and somehow good or excellent condition of the other ear. The essential difference from the ordinary dullness earphones of optic glasses type, or any other type or system, is the addition of a second microphone in the altitude of the ear with necrosis. By the use of this device the patient may perceive low intensity sounds even whistles as well as the sound of a telephone earphone from the side and close to the ear with necrosis. This device consists of: 1. Microphone: mini condensing microphone (ordinary) 2. Pre-amplifier of acoustic frequencies (ordinary) 3. Earphone: (or sound vibrations system for incitement through the cranial bones, of the acoustic nerve), for the healthy ear (ordinary). 4. Batteries and switch on-off (ordinary) 5. Adjuster for voice volume (ordinary).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 25/554 (2013.01); H04R 2225/53 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993232 A2 20000412; EP 0993232 A3 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04R 25/00 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02C 11/06 B

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI