Global Patent Index - EP 0993238 A1

EP 0993238 A1 2000-04-12 - Electrical insulation and cooling material for a high-voltage supply device

Title (en)

Electrical insulation and cooling material for a high-voltage supply device

Title (de)

Elektroisolier- und Kühlmaterial für eine Hochspannungsversorgungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Matériau d'isolation électrique et de refroidissement pour un dispositif d'alimentation haute tension

Publication

EP 0993238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307849 A

Priority

FR 9812443 A

Abstract (en)

Insulation and cooling material for high-voltage supply devices is a composite of at least one thermoplastic polymer and of at least one particulate ceramic filler so that the matieral has a thermal conductivity of at least 0.9 W/M.K. The thermoplastic polymer may be polypropylenes, poly (etherimides), poly(phenylsulphides) and poly(etherimide)/poly(phenyl-sulphide) mixtures. The particulate ceramic fillers may be alumina, aluminum nitride, boron nitride, barium suplhate and beryllium oxide and mixtures thereof. The high-voltage supply device is intended for X-ray tubes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05G 1/04; H01B 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05G 1/02 (2006.01); H01B 3/00 (2006.01); H01B 3/12 (2006.01); H01B 3/42 (2006.01); H01B 3/44 (2006.01); H05G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 3/441 (2013.01); H01B 3/427 (2013.01); H01B 3/445 (2013.01); H05G 1/025 (2013.01); H05G 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0993238 A1 20000412; CN 1218007 C 20050907; CN 1256300 A 20000614; FR 2784261 A1 20000407; FR 2784261 B1 20010727; IL 131930 D0 20010319; JP 2000123635 A 20000428; KR 20000028811 A 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081022

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041125

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI