Global Patent Index - EP 0993265 A1

EP 0993265 A1 2000-04-19 - CLEANER

Title (en)

CLEANER

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL NETTOYEUR

Publication

EP 0993265 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940138 A

Priority

  • DE 19728441 A
  • EP 9804140 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728441C1] The two drums (2,3) rotate in opposite directions on parallel axes in the frame (1), on which is a push-handle (8). The handle protrudes from the frame in the direction of the axes of rotation of the drums, and turns on an axis parallel to those of the latter together with the frame. At its end furthest from the latter, the handle can have grips (12) at right angles to it, these being symmetrically situated in relation to a vertical plane between and parallel to the drum axes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/40; A47L 9/32; B25G 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/18 (2006.01); A47L 11/24 (2006.01); A47L 11/282 (2006.01); A47L 11/32 (2006.01); A47L 11/40 (2006.01); B25G 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4061 (2013.01); A47L 11/24 (2013.01); A47L 11/32 (2013.01); A47L 11/4075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901062A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728441 C1 19981029; AU 8856198 A 19990125; EP 0993265 A1 20000419; EP 0993265 B1 20011017; JP 2000512199 A 20000919; US 6321406 B1 20011127; WO 9901062 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-03-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040704

2003-06-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALFRED *KARCHER G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801799 20011122

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE

2001-10-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991120

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL SE