Global Patent Index - EP 0993267 A1

EP 0993267 A1 2000-04-19 - IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR SENSING ABSOLUTE BLOOD PRESSURE AND BAROMETRIC PRESSURE

Title (en)

IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR SENSING ABSOLUTE BLOOD PRESSURE AND BAROMETRIC PRESSURE

Title (de)

IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES ABSOLUTEN BLUTDRUCKES UND DES BAROMETRISCHEN DRUCKES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE DE DETECTION DE LA PRESSION SANGUINE ET DE LA PRESSION BAROMETRIQUE ABSOLUES

Publication

EP 0993267 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919938 A

Priority

  • US 9908736 W
  • US 7031098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955223A1] An implantable barometric pressure sensor (220) coupled with an implantable medical device (IMD) provides a barometric pressure related, referenced pressure value for use in combination with an absolute pressure value measured by an implantable absolute pressure sensor (20) coupled to the IMD. In one embodiment, the barometric pressure sensor (220) is formed as part of a connector module (180) of the IMD or extends from the connector module (180). A percutaneous access device (360) is implanted to extend through the skin and subcutaneous tissue layer of the patient and is coupled with the barometric pressure sensor (220). The barometric pressure sensor (220) is preferably enclosed within an air chamber (170) of the implantable medical device, and a catheter (310) extends between the air chamber (170) of the implantable medical device and the percutaneous access device (360). Or the barometric pressure sensor (220) is enclosed within an air chamber (368) of the percutaneous access device, and a lead extends between the barometric pressure sensor (220) and the implantable medical device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/0215; A61B 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0215 (2006.01); A61B 5/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0215 (2013.01); A61B 5/03 (2013.01); A61B 2560/0257 (2013.01); A61M 1/122 (2013.01); A61M 2205/702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955223A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955223 A1 19991104; DE 69930113 D1 20060427; DE 69930113 T2 20061005; EP 0993267 A1 20000419; EP 0993267 B1 20060301; US 6024704 A 20000215; US 6234973 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69930113

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69930113 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDTRONIC, INC.

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030602

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEADOR, JOHN, T.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIESEL, KEITH, A.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HALPERIN, LOUIS, E.

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAEPKE, ROBERT, T., II

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STYLOS, LEE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR