Global Patent Index - EP 0993289 A1

EP 0993289 A1 2000-04-19 - DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING AN INCREASED FIT FOR THE BODY ANATOMY

Title (en)

DISPOSABLE ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING AN INCREASED FIT FOR THE BODY ANATOMY

Title (de)

ABSORBIERENDE WEGWERFARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTEM SITZ FÜR DIE KÖRPERANATOMIE

Title (fr)

ARTICLES ABSORBANTS JETABLES EPOUSANT AU MIEUX L'ANATOMIE

Publication

EP 0993289 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925893 A

Priority

  • EP 98925893 A
  • EP 97110735 A
  • IB 9801007 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0888763A1] A tridimensional disposable absorbent article having a body facing surface and a garment facing surface, a longitudinal symmetry plane, a front end edge and a rear end edge, and comprising a liquid pervious topsheet, a backsheet joined to said topsheet and an absorbent core intermediate the backsheet and the topsheet. The absorbent core has a front portion, a central portion and a rear portion, and comprises a longitudinally oriented ridge in the central and rear portion having a profile that provides for an increased body fit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/00 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/472 (2006.01); A61F 13/514 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/47227 (2013.01); A61F 13/47263 (2013.01); A61F 13/4758 (2013.01); A61F 2013/455 (2013.01); A61F 2013/4568 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901095A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0888763 A1 19990107; AR 016124 A1 20010620; AU 7785098 A 19990125; BR 9810533 A 20000912; CA 2295730 A1 19990114; CN 1268038 A 20000927; CO 5060493 A1 20010730; EG 21506 A 20011128; EP 0993289 A1 20000419; HU 0003531 A2 20010228; HU 0003531 A3 20010328; ID 28108 A 20010503; IL 133675 D0 20010430; JP 2001509403 A 20010724; KR 20010014399 A 20010226; NO 996583 A 20000228; NO 996583 D0 19991230; PE 102199 A1 19991210; PL 337727 A1 20000828; SK 186999 A3 20000912; TR 9903321 T2 20000921; WO 9901095 A1 19990114; ZA 9805729 B 19990106; ZA 9805731 B 19990106; ZA 9805732 B 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028181

2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE