Global Patent Index - EP 0993294 A1

EP 0993294 A1 2000-04-19 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH MULTI-LAYERED EXTENSIBLE WINGS

Title (en)

ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH MULTI-LAYERED EXTENSIBLE WINGS

Title (de)

ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VIELSCHICHTIGEN DEHNFÄHIGEN FLÜGELN

Title (fr)

ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC COTES EXTENSIBLES MULTICOUCHES

Publication

EP 0993294 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932949 A

Priority

  • US 9813498 W
  • US 88547897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900093A1] Absorbent articles for wearing in an undergarment, such as sanitary napkins, panty liners, incontinence pads, and the like, which have wings (or side flaps) are disclosed. The absorbent articles typically have a liquid pervious topsheet, a liquid impervious backsheet joined to the topsheet, and an absorbent core positioned between the topsheet and backsheet. In one embodiment, the flaps are comprised of extensions of the topsheet and backsheet. The extensions of the topsheet and backsheet are provided with extensible portions therein. At least portions of the extensible portions of the topsheet and backsheet are located inboard of the longitudinal side edges of the absorbent core of the absorbent article.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/56 (2006.01); A61F 5/44 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/476 (2013.01); A61F 2013/51322 (2013.01); A61F 2013/51429 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900093 A1 19990107; AU 8272498 A 19990119; BR 9810382 A 20000905; CA 2295051 A1 19990107; CN 1268039 A 20000927; EP 0993294 A1 20000419; ID 28186 A 20010510; JP 2002508693 A 20020319; KR 20010014405 A 20010226; TW 409052 B 20001021; ZA 9805679 B 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028180

2001-12-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011009

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PATTERSON, REBECCA, WHITE

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OSBORN, THOMAS, WARD, III

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERSHBERGER, MICHAEL, NYLE

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILKINS, LESLIE, ANNE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE