Global Patent Index - EP 0993301 A4

EP 0993301 A4 2000-04-19 - COCAINE RECEPTOR BINDING LIGANDS

Title (en)

COCAINE RECEPTOR BINDING LIGANDS

Title (de)

COCAIN-REZEPTOR BINDENDE LIGANDEN

Title (fr)

LIGANDS LIANT DES RECEPTEURS DE COCAINE

Publication

EP 0993301 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97940580 A

Priority

  • US 9714702 W
  • US 70150396 A
  • US 70626396 A
  • US 82356397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807427A1] The invention relates to novel compounds which show high affinity for cocaine receptors in the brain, particularly dopamine and serotonin transporter sites. The compounds may be used as imaging or pharmaceutical agents, in the diagnosis and treatment of drug addiction, depression, anorexia and neurodegenerative diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/46; A61P 25/16; A61P 25/30; C07D 451/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/46 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 25/30 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 451/02 (2006.01); C07F 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 451/02 (2013.01); C07F 7/2212 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9309814 A1 19930527 - RES TRIANGLE INST [US], et al
  • [Y] CARROLL F I ET AL: "Synthesis and ligand binding of 3.beta.-(3-substituted phenyl)- and 3.beta.-(3,4-disubstituted phenyl)tropane-2.beta.-carboxylic acid methyl esters", MED. CHEM. RES. (MCREEB,10542523);1991; VOL.1 (6); PP.382-7, Res. Triangle Inst.;Chem. Life Sci.; Research Triangle Park; 27709; NC; USA (US), XP002116826
  • [Y] CARROLL F I ET AL: "Cocaine receptor: biochemical characterization and structure-activity relationships of cocaine analogs at the dopamine transporter", J. MED. CHEM. (JMCMAR,00222623);1992; VOL.35 (6); PP.969-81, Research Triangle Inst.;Research Triangle Park; 27709; NC; USA (US), XP002116827
  • [A] CARROLL F I ET AL: "Cocaine receptor-design of ligands", NIDA RES. MONOGR. (MIDAD4,03618595);1990; VOL.96 (DRUGS ABUSE: CHEM., PHARMACOL., IMMUNOL., AIDS); PP.112-21, Research Triangle Inst.;Research Triangle Park; 27709; NC; USA (US), XP002116828
  • [Y] CARROLL F I ET AL: "3-Aryl-2-(3'-substituted-1',2',4'-oxadiazol-5'-yl)tropane analogs of cocaine: affinities at the cocaine binding site at the dopamine, serotonin, and norepinephrine transporters", J. MED. CHEM. (JMCMAR,00222623);1993; VOL.36 (20); PP.2886-90, Research Triangle Inst.;Research Triangle Park; 27709; NC; USA (US), XP002116829
  • See also references of WO 9807427A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807427 A1 19980226; AT 236635 T 20030415; AU 4232797 A 19980306; CA 2263961 A1 19980226; CA 2263961 C 20070306; DE 69720800 D1 20030515; DE 69720800 T2 20040129; EP 0993301 A1 20000419; EP 0993301 A4 20000419; EP 0993301 B1 20030409; JP 2001525795 A 20011211; JP 2009102364 A 20090514; JP 4354531 B2 20091028; US 5935953 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69720800

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120822

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-06-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-08-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-07-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990727

2000-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE