Global Patent Index - EP 0993325 A1

EP 0993325 A1 2000-04-19 - PLANKS USED FOR SLIDING ON SNOW

Title (en)

PLANKS USED FOR SLIDING ON SNOW

Title (de)

SCHNEEGLEITBRETT

Title (fr)

PLANCHE POUR LA GLISSE SUR LA NEIGE

Publication

EP 0993325 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928047 A

Priority

  • CH 9800284 W
  • CH 157097 A
  • US 5186597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901186A1] The invention relates to planks used for sliding on snow, having a central part (1) situated between a lower and upper flange. The central part (1) contains areas (11, 13) made of light materials and areas (12.1, 12.2,..., 14, 15) made of reinforcing materials. As a result, the board has the following properties: low empty weight, high transversal strength and high resistance to pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/12; A63C 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/03 (2006.01); A63C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/126 (2013.01); A63C 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901186A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901186 A1 19990114; AT 225676 T 20021015; CA 2294210 A1 19990114; DE 59805906 D1 20021114; EP 0993325 A1 20000419; EP 0993325 B1 20021009; JP 2002507139 A 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RENTSCH & PARTNER;FRAUMUENSTERSTRASSE 9, POSTFACH 2441;8022 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SHAUN PALMER LTD.

- Free text: DAKUGA HOLDING LTD.#LANDHAUS#8865 BILTEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SHAUN PALMER LTD.#LANDHAUS#8865 BILTEN (CH)

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-08-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: IP&T RENTSCH UND PARTNER

2003-01-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805906 20021114

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-10-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225676 T 20021015

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE