Global Patent Index - EP 0993340 A1

EP 0993340 A1 2000-04-19 - VIBRATORY CONE MILL EQUIPPED WITH FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

VIBRATORY CONE MILL EQUIPPED WITH FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VIBRATIONS-KEGELBRECHER MIT ZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

BROYEUR VIBRANT A CONE VERTICAL EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 0993340 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98933725 A

Priority

  • FR 9801354 W
  • FR 9708458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765122A1] The invention concerns a device for feeding (1) a material treating plant (2) such as a mill, comprising an outer shell (3) and a bell (6), provided at least inside said outer shell (3) and fixed thereto, said bell (6) being arranged substantially oriented parallel to the direction of flow of the material, so as to enable said material to be deviated in order to protect elements (9) arranged downstream of said plant (2). The invention also concerns a vibratory mill (2) with vertical cone (16) equipped with such a feed device (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 2/00; B02C 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 2/04 (2006.01); B02C 2/00 (2006.01); B02C 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 2/007 (2013.01); B02C 23/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901222A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765122 A1 19981231; FR 2765122 B1 19990827; AU 741645 B2 20011206; AU 8344798 A 19990125; BR 9810352 A 20020521; CA 2295712 A1 19990114; CA 2295712 C 20041102; CN 1107548 C 20030507; CN 1263482 A 20000816; DE 69823828 D1 20040617; DE 69823828 T2 20050623; DK 0993340 T3 20040816; EP 0993340 A1 20000419; EP 0993340 B1 20040512; ES 2221180 T3 20041216; MA 24588 A1 19981231; NO 326433 B1 20081208; NO 996552 A 20000223; NO 996552 D0 19991229; NZ 501980 A 20010629; RU 2197325 C2 20030127; TR 9903298 T2 20000821; US 6325313 B1 20011204; WO 9901222 A1 19990114; ZA 9805661 B 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110627

2012-02-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221180 T3

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-08-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOLIOS CARBONE

2004-08-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FCB CIMENT

2004-08-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823828 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT SE

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VIBRATORY CONE MILL EQUIPPED WITH FEEDING DEVICE

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030327

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES GB IT SE