Global Patent Index - EP 0993347 A1

EP 0993347 A1 2000-04-19 - TAB MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

TAB MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUGRING

Title (fr)

FABRICATION D'UNE TIRETTE

Publication

EP 0993347 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930928 A

Priority

  • GB 9801834 W
  • GB 9714063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901243A1] A method and apparatus for making a tab for an easy open can end in which the tab comprises a handle (30), a fixing hole (40) for a rivet and a nose for breaking a score on the end. The method includes a curling step, the curling tool (50) for this step is modified to provide not only a peripheral curl around the tab but also a pair of lugs either side of the apex of the nose. These lugs have been found to give greatly improved abuse resistance and significantly to reduce initial opening force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/00 (2006.01); B21D 51/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/383 (2013.01); B65D 17/4011 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901243A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901243 A1 19990114; AU 8120498 A 19990125; DE 69801327 D1 20010913; DE 69801327 T2 20011122; EP 0993347 A1 20000419; EP 0993347 B1 20010808; GB 9714063 D0 19970910

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030623

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030623

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020520

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801327 20010913

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT