Global Patent Index - EP 0993378 A1

EP 0993378 A1 2000-04-19 - INK CROSS-LINKING BY UV RADIATION

Title (en)

INK CROSS-LINKING BY UV RADIATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HÄRTEN VON FARBEN MITTELS UV-LICHT

Title (fr)

RETICULATION D'ENCRE U.V.

Publication

EP 0993378 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98932230 A

Priority

  • FR 9801281 W
  • FR 9708176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764844A1] The invention concerns a method for cross-linking photosensitive inks in particular polymerisable inks (36) by ultraviolet radiation consisting in a step (35) inking dots (31) on a base (38) and a subsequent step consisting in applying a concentrated ultraviolet beam (32) on the inked dots (31), except for the base non-inked surfaces (30). The beam is in particular an ultraviolet laser beam. The invention is applicable to jet dot-matrix printing and polychromy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/48 (2006.01); B41M 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/0047 (2013.01); B41J 11/002 (2013.01); B41M 5/0064 (2013.01); B41M 7/0081 (2013.01); B41M 5/0076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858806A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764844 A1 19981224; FR 2764844 B1 19990806; AT 206090 T 20011015; AT 321671 T 20060415; CA 2293551 A1 19981230; CA 2293551 C 20051108; CN 1178799 C 20041208; CN 1260753 A 20000719; DE 69801823 D1 20011031; DE 69801823 T2 20020613; DE 69833974 D1 20060518; DE 69833974 T2 20070111; EP 0993378 A1 20000419; EP 0993378 B1 20010926; EP 1162079 A2 20011212; EP 1162079 A3 20021113; EP 1162079 B1 20060329; ES 2165688 T3 20020316; ES 2262582 T3 20061201; JP 2002504873 A 20020212; JP 4125796 B2 20080730; US 6562413 B1 20030513; WO 9858806 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140619

2015-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150729

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140618

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEMALTO SA, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-06-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2011-07-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110616 AND 20110622

2011-01-12 [REG GB S117] CORRECTION OF ERRORS IN PATENTS AND APPLICATIONS (SECT. 117/PATENTS ACT 1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: S117

- Free Format Text: REQUEST FILED; REQUEST FOR CORRECTION UNDER SECTION 117 FILED ON 26 APRIL 2010

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEMPLUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-09-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2165688

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011226

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69801823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-31

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE

2001-09-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 206090

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEMPLUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI GB IT NL SE