Global Patent Index - EP 0993395 A1

EP 0993395 A1 2000-04-19 - CURRENT MEASUREMENT MODULE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE STARTER DEVICE

Title (en)

CURRENT MEASUREMENT MODULE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE STARTER DEVICE

Title (de)

STROMMESSMODUL FÜR EINE STARTEINRICHTUNG VON BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

MODULE DE MESURE DE COURANT POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0993395 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941788 A

Priority

  • DE 9701713 W
  • DE 19730635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6305338B1] A current measuring module for a starter device of an internal combustion engine has a measuring device which measures a starter current of a starter motor, a soft-iron core which at least partly surrounds a conductor carrying a starter current and carries a magnetic field sensor, and control electronics controlled by the magnetic field sensor and generating a control signal for switching off the starter motor when a switch-off current of the starter motor is reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 15/20 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/0848 (2013.01); F02N 2200/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903709A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6305338 B1 20011023; EP 0993395 A1 20000419; EP 0993395 B1 20021127; JP 2001510257 A 20010731; JP 4108920 B2 20080625; WO 9903709 A1 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59708845

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-08-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59708845

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT