Global Patent Index - EP 0993404 A2

EP 0993404 A2 2000-04-19 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING AND ADVANCING GROUPS OF CONTAINERS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING AND ADVANCING GROUPS OF CONTAINERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN UND FÖRDERN VON BEHÄLTERGRUPPEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION ET D'AVANCEMENT DE GROUPES DE RECIPIENTS

Publication

EP 0993404 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98932133 A

Priority

  • EP 9803419 W
  • IT MO970106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856660A2] A method comprises advancing strips parallely to each other along a path extending longitudinally of the strips, heat-welding together and thermo-forming said strips to form containers aligned longitudinally in groups side-by-side in pairs of groups along said strips, severing said strips transversely between the pairs of groups, and filling and sealing the containers in the groups; relative turning of the groups of each pair of groups is produced through substantially 180 DEG to orient upwardly inlets of all of the containers of the two groups of each pair, and subsequently the containers are filled and sealed; apparatus comprises blow-thermoforming means to form containers aligned in rows from a pair of thermoplatic strips, turning means arranged to produce relative turning of groups of formed containers through substantially 180 DEG to orient upwardly inlets of the containers, advancing means arranged to advance the strips parallely to each other along a path extending longitudinally of the strips, severing means arranged to sever said strips transversely between the pairs of groups, and filling and sealing means arranged to fill and seal the containers in the groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856660A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856660 A2 19981217; WO 9856660 A3 19990304; AU 8214398 A 19981230; DE 69822464 D1 20040422; DE 69822464 T2 20050224; EP 0993404 A2 20000419; EP 0993404 B1 20040317; IT 1297943 B1 19991220; IT MO970106 A1 19981209

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2004-05-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822464 P 20040422

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI