Global Patent Index - EP 0993417 B1

EP 0993417 B1 2001-05-23 - INSTALLATION FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS IN CONTAINERS CLOSED WITH A CORK AND DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC STORAGE OF CORKS USED THEREIN

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR PACKAGING PRODUCTS IN CONTAINERS CLOSED WITH A CORK AND DEVICE FOR DYNAMIC STORAGE OF CORKS USED THEREIN

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUM ABFÜLLEN EINES PRODUKTS IN MITTELS EINES STOPFENS ZU VERSCHLIESSENDE BEHÄLTER UND DARIN ANWENDBARE DYNAMISCHE STOPFENLAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UN PRODUIT DANS DES RECIPIENTS FERMES PAR UN BOUCHON ET DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DYNAMIQUE DE BOUCHONS UTILISABLE DANS CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 0993417 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98935076 A

Priority

  • FR 9801409 W
  • FR 9708426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765566A1] The invention concerns an installation for packaging a product in containers closed with a cork, comprising in particular a filling machine (1), a corking machine (3) and, upstream thereof, a device (6) for the dynamic storage of corks for continuously driving the corks at a predetermined step, the number of corks simultaneously present in the device (6) being not less than that of containers present in a predetermined portion (7) of the machine, means (8) for controlling the supply in corks being provided upstream of the device (6) for controlling a device (10) supplying containers located upstream of the predetermined portion (7). Thus, for each container engaged in the predetermined portion (7) corresponds a cork present in the device (6) supplying the corking machine (3) and, in case of shortage in the supply of corks upstream of the device (6), the supply of containers to the predetermined portion (7) is controlled while the operation of the terminal portion of the installation is maintained at least until the shortage is over.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 7/00; B67B 3/062

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 49/28 (2006.01); B67B 3/062 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 7/0006 (2013.01); B67B 3/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765566 A1 19990108; FR 2765566 B1 19990917; AT 201385 T 20010615; AU 751992 B2 20020905; AU 8445298 A 19990125; BR 9810391 A 20000905; CA 2295845 A1 19990114; CA 2295845 C 20040217; CN 1106339 C 20030423; CN 1259104 A 20000705; DE 69800834 D1 20010628; DE 69800834 T2 20011129; DK 0993417 T3 20010910; EP 0993417 A1 20000419; EP 0993417 B1 20010523; ES 2159188 T3 20010916; GR 3036198 T3 20011031; JP 2002507177 A 20020305; KR 20010020466 A 20010315; PT 993417 E 20011030; US 2002033007 A1 20020321; US 6341469 B1 20020129; US 6401973 B1 20020611; WO 9901375 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160701

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800834

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150707

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090702

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-03-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIDEL

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159188 T3

2001-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800834 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201385 T 20010615

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE