Global Patent Index - EP 0993448 A1

EP 0993448 A1 2000-04-19 - (AMIDINO)6-MEMBERED AROMATICS AS FACTOR Xa INHIBITORS

Title (en)

(AMIDINO)6-MEMBERED AROMATICS AS FACTOR Xa INHIBITORS

Title (de)

(AMIDINO)6-GLIEDRIGE AROMATEN ALS FACTOR XA INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

AGENTS AROMATIQUES A SIX MEMBRES AMIDINO UTILES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR XA

Publication

EP 0993448 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930362 A

Priority

  • US 9812682 W
  • US 87856297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857934A1] The present application describes 6-membered aromatics of formula (I) or pharmaceutically acceptable salt forms thereof, wherein D may be CH2NH2 or C(=NH)NH2, which are useful as inhibitors of factor Xa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 213/79; A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857934A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857934 A1 19981223; AU 7976998 A 19990104; CA 2293824 A1 19981223; EP 0993448 A1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB PHARMA COMPANY

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUPONT PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU NL PT SE