Global Patent Index - EP 0993473 A1

EP 0993473 A1 2000-04-19 - HIGH TEMPERATURE, CONTROLLED STRENGTH ANAEROBIC ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS CURABLE UNDER AMBIENT ENVIRONMENTAL CONDITIONS

Title (en)

HIGH TEMPERATURE, CONTROLLED STRENGTH ANAEROBIC ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS CURABLE UNDER AMBIENT ENVIRONMENTAL CONDITIONS

Title (de)

ANAEROBE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN KONTROLLIERTER STÄRKE FÜR HOHE TEMPERATUREN WELCHE BEI UMGEBUNGSBEDINGUNGEN HÄRTBAR SIND

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ADHESIVES ANAEROBIES A RESISTANCE CONTROLEE POUR HAUTES TEMPERATURES, DURCISSABLES DANS DES CONDITIONS AMBIANTES

Publication

EP 0993473 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98935513 A

Priority

  • US 9813704 W
  • US 88800297 A
  • US 6196197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9901484A1] The present invention provides anaerobic adhesive compositions, reaction products of which demonstrate controlled-strength at ambient temperature conditions and enhanced resistance to thermal degradation at elevated temperature conditions. The compositions are (meth)acrylate- and/or polyorganosiloxane-based and may include one or more of a variety of other components, such as certain coreactants, a maleimide component, a diluent component reactive at elevated temperature conditions, mono or poly-hydroxyalkane compoenents, and other components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 26/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 290/06 (2006.01); C08F 220/10 (2006.01); C08F 222/40 (2006.01); C09J 4/00 (2006.01); C09J 4/02 (2006.01); C09J 4/06 (2006.01); C09J 183/04 (2006.01); C09J 183/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09J 4/00 (2013.01); C09J 4/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09J 4/00 + C08F 222/1006
  2. C09J 4/00 + C08G 77/20
  3. C09J 4/06 + C08F 290/148

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9901484 A1 19990114; AT 456588 T 20100215; AU 731141 B2 20010322; AU 8474698 A 19990125; BR 9810357 A 20000829; CA 2299417 A1 19990114; CA 2299417 C 20091208; CA 2679577 A1 19990114; CA 2679577 C 20130813; CN 1158314 C 20040721; CN 1265118 A 20000830; DE 69841485 D1 20100318; EP 0993473 A1 20000419; EP 0993473 A4 20021009; EP 1795544 A2 20070613; EP 1795544 A3 20071128; EP 1795544 B1 20100127; ES 2338598 T3 20100510; JP 2002513441 A 20020508; JP 5001477 B2 20120815; KR 20010020552 A 20010315; PT 1795544 E 20100302; RU 2213759 C2 20031010

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20070111

2007-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070103

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL LOCTITE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-12-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 08F 26/06 A, 7C 09J 11/00 B, 7C 09J 133/00 B, 7C 08F 20/00 B, 7C 08F 220/00 B

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE