Global patent index - EP 0993497 A1

EP 0993497 A1 2000-04-19 - PYROLYSIS FURNACE WITH AN INTERNALLY FINNED U-SHAPED RADIANT COIL

Title (en)

PYROLYSIS FURNACE WITH AN INTERNALLY FINNED U-SHAPED RADIANT COIL

Title (de)

PYROLYSE-OFEN MIT INTERNER U-FÖRMIGER GERIPPTER STRAHLENDER SPULE

Title (fr)

FOUR DE PYROLYSE EQUIPE D'UN SERPENTIN RAYONNANT EN U A AILETTES INTERNES

Publication

EP 0993497 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926463 A

Priority

  • US 9811902 W
  • US 4952997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856872A1] The present invention is directed towards a fired heater for heating a process fluid that uses U tubes provided with increased internal heat transfer surface to reduce tube metal temperatures and coking, and at the same time is not prone to plugging from coke. The fired heater comprises a radiant section enclosure with a number of U tubes in the radiant section. The U tubes are formed by connecting one or more tubular sections, and the U tubes are provided with internal generally longitudinal fins. The invention also is directed towards a process utilizing a fined heater with U tubes as disclosed for producing olefins from hydrocarbon feedstocks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 9/20 (2006.01); F28D 7/06 (2006.01); F28F 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 8/062 (2013.01); C10G 9/20 (2013.01); F28D 7/06 (2013.01); F28F 1/40 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0059 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856872A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856872 A1 19981217; AR 015388 A1 20010502; AT 208417 T 20011115; AT 272697 T 20040815; AU 737015 B2 20010809; AU 7829698 A 19981230; BR 9811468 A 20000919; CA 2290540 A1 19981217; CA 2290540 C 20071009; CN 1195823 C 20050406; CN 1259981 A 20000712; DE 69802404 D1 20011213; DE 69802404 T2 20020718; DE 69825494 D1 20040909; DE 69825494 T2 20050728; EP 0993497 A1 20000419; EP 0993497 B1 20011107; EP 1136541 A1 20010926; EP 1136541 B1 20040804; ES 2225400 T3 20050316; HU 0003033 A2 20010628; ID 24474 A 20000720; JP 2002504170 A 20020205; JP 4819205 B2 20111124; MY 122107 A 20060331; NO 327767 B1 20090921; NO 996083 A 20000208; NO 996083 D0 19991209; PL 337179 A1 20000814; PT 1136541 E 20041231; RU 2211854 C2 20030910; TW 387933 B 20000421; US 2002034463 A1 20020321; US 2002159934 A1 20021031; US 6419885 B1 20020716; US 6719953 B2 20040413; ZA 9805021 B 19990125

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-04-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-02-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208417

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE