Global Patent Index - EP 0993500 A1

EP 0993500 A1 2000-04-19 - SPLIT-FEED TWO-STAGE PARALLEL AROMATIZATION FOR MAXIMUM PARA-XYLENE YIELD

Title (en)

SPLIT-FEED TWO-STAGE PARALLEL AROMATIZATION FOR MAXIMUM PARA-XYLENE YIELD

Title (de)

ZWEISTUFIGE AROMATISATION FÜR MAXIMALE PARA-XYLEN-AUSBEUTE MIT GETEILTER EINSPEISUNG

Title (fr)

AROMATISATION A CHARGE PARTAGEE, EN DEUX ETAPES POUR RENDEMENT MAXIMAL EN PARAXYLENE

Publication

EP 0993500 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97929844 A

Priority

US 9709890 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858041A1] A full boiling hydrocarbon feed is reformed to enhance para-xylene and benzene yields. First, the hydrocarbon feed is separated into a C5- cut, a C6-C7 cut, and a C8+ cut. The C6-C7 cut has less than 5 lv. % of C8+ hydrocarbon, and the C8+ cut has less than 10 lv. % of C7- hydrocarbon. The C6-C7 cut is subjected to catalytic aromatization at elevated temperatures in a first reformer in the presence of hydrogen and using a non-acidic catalyst comprising at least one Group VIII metal and a non-acidic zeolite support to produce a first reformate stream; and the C8+ cut is subjected to catalytic aromatization at elevated temperatures in a second reformer in the presence of hydrogen and using an acidic catalyst comprising at least one Group VIII metal and a metallic oxide support to produce a second reformate stream. Less than 20 wt.% of the total amount of C8 aromatics produced in the first and second reformer is ethylbenzene, and more than 20 wt.% of the total amount of xylenes produced in the first and second reformer are para-xylenes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 59/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 35/09 (2006.01); C10G 35/095 (2006.01); C10G 59/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 59/06 (2013.01); C10G 35/095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858041 A1 19981223; CA 2287938 A1 19981223; DE 69715682 D1 20021024; DE 69715682 T2 20030528; EP 0993500 A1 20000419; EP 0993500 B1 20020918; JP 2002504180 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL CY LP

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060616

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715682 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL