Global Patent Index - EP 0993504 A1

EP 0993504 A1 2000-04-19 - PRODUCTION OF DETERGENT GRANULATES

Title (en)

PRODUCTION OF DETERGENT GRANULATES

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON WASCHMITTELGRANULATEN

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION DE GRANULES DETERGENTS

Publication

EP 0993504 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933629 A

Priority

  • EP 9803669 W
  • GB 9712587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858048A1] A process of forming granular detergent products, the process comprising, in a gas fluidisation granulator, contacting a fluidised particulate solid material with a spray of liquid binder, whilst fluidising the solids in the granulator with at least one gas stream, wherein the gas temperature is controlled so as to be increased and/or reduced during at least one stage of the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 11/00; C11D 11/04; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858048A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858048 A1 19981223; AR 013093 A1 20001213; AU 725182 B2 20001005; AU 8338298 A 19990104; BR 9810165 A 20000808; CA 2294287 A1 19981223; CN 1170917 C 20041013; CN 1267329 A 20000920; DE 69804457 D1 20020502; DE 69804457 T2 20021017; EA 002160 B1 20011224; EA 200000024 A1 20000626; EP 0993504 A1 20000419; EP 0993504 B1 20020327; ES 2174457 T3 20021101; GB 9712587 D0 19970820; HU 0003031 A2 20010129; HU 0003031 A3 20030228; ID 24618 A 20000727; IN 189876 B 20030503; PL 186896 B1 20040331; PL 337431 A1 20000814; TR 199903104 T2 20000321; TW 432108 B 20010501; ZA 9805194 B 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021223

2005-08-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-02-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-02-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174457 T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804457 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT