Global Patent Index - EP 0993513 A4

EP 0993513 A4 2001-04-04 - IMPEDANCE-ASSISTED ELECTROCHEMICAL TECHNIQUE AND ELECTROCHEMISTRY FOR REMOVING MATERIAL, PARTICULARLY EXCESS EMITTER MATERIAL IN ELECTRON-EMITTING DEVICE

Title (en)

IMPEDANCE-ASSISTED ELECTROCHEMICAL TECHNIQUE AND ELECTROCHEMISTRY FOR REMOVING MATERIAL, PARTICULARLY EXCESS EMITTER MATERIAL IN ELECTRON-EMITTING DEVICE

Title (de)

IMPEDANZUNTERSTÜTZTES ELEKTROCHEMISCHES VERFAHREN UND ELEKRTOCHEMIE ZUM ENTFERNEN VON MATERIAL, INSBESONDERE VON ÜBERFLÜSSIGEM EMITTERENDEM MATERIAL, IN EINER ELEKTRONENEMITTIERENDEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE ELECTROCHIMIQUE ASSISTEE PAR IMPEDANCE ET PROCEDE ELECTROCHIMIQUE PERMETTANT D'ELIMINER UN MATERIAU, NOTAMMENT UN MATERIAU GENERATEUR D'EXCEDENTS, DANS UN DISPOSITIF EMETTEUR D'ELECTRONS

Publication

EP 0993513 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98931401 A

Priority

  • US 9812801 W
  • US 88470097 A
  • US 88470197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900537A1] An impedance-assisted electrochemical procedure is employed for selectively removing certain material from a structure without significantly electrochemically attacking, and thus without significantly removing, certain other material of the same chemical type as the removed material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/02; B23H 3/00; B44C 1/22; C25D 5/48; C25F 3/00; C25F 5/00; H01J 1/02; H01J 1/62; H01J 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25F 5/00 (2006.01); C25F 3/02 (2006.01); C25F 3/14 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] WO 9606443 A1 19960229 - ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al
  • [A] WO 9709730 A2 19970313 - FED CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9507543 A1 19950316 - SILICON VIDEO CORP [US]
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199116, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E14, AN 1991-112827, XP002144729
  • [PX] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, no. 6, 10 August 1998, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 73363, KOBAYASHI, NOBUO ET AL: "Electrolytic bath and method for electrolytic peeling" XP002144728 & JP H10140400 A 19980526 - EBARA UDYLITE KK
  • See also references of WO 9900537A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900537 A1 19990107; EP 0993513 A1 20000419; EP 0993513 A4 20010404; EP 0993513 B1 20090107; JP 2001508834 A 20010703; JP 3648255 B2 20050518; KR 100621293 B1 20060913; KR 20010014008 A 20010226

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140629

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69840443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140629

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69840443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69840443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WESER & KOLLEGEN, DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090629

2010-03-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028264

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2009-12-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20091008

2009-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69840443

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-02-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2009-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2009-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040507

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANDESCENT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 25D 5/02 A, 7C 25D 5/48 B, 7B 23H 3/00 B, 7H 01J 1/02 B, 7H 01J 1/62 B, 7B 44C 1/22 B, 7H 01J 9/02 B, 7C 25F 3/00 B, 7C 25F 5/00 B

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 25D 5/02 A, 7C 25D 5/48 B, 7B 23H 3/00 B, 7H 01J 1/02 B, 7H 01J 1/62 B, 7B 44C 1/22 B, 7H 01J 9/02 B

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE