Global Patent Index - EP 0993514 A1

EP 0993514 A1 2000-04-19 - DEVICE FOR STRETCHING AND TENSING A WEFT YARN

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STRETCHING AND TENSING A WEFT YARN

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM STRECKEN UND SPANNEN EINES SCHUSSFADENS UND WEBMASCHINE MIT EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ETIRER ET TENDRE UN FIL DE TRAME

Publication

EP 0993514 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920441 A

Priority

  • CH 9800223 W
  • DE 19728013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728013A1] The inventive device comprises a nozzle holder (5) with a channel (8) for receiving a weft yarn, and a nozzle (6) with holes (14) for stretching and tensing the weft yarn. The nozzle (6) is mounted on the holder in such a way that the nozzle can be adjusted in relation to the direction of the weft, in particular so that it can be pivoted or displaced. The device is characterized in that it facilitates optimum adjustment of intersecting air jets and guarantees a deflection of the weft yarn (9) independently of the yarn type. Furthermore, it ensures that the weft yarn is held taut.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/04 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901599A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728013 A1 19990107; AU 7329798 A 19990125; BR 9810505 A 20000905; CA 2294799 A1 19990114; CA 2294799 C 20060221; CN 1092729 C 20021016; CN 1261933 A 20000802; CZ 294692 B6 20050216; CZ 9904779 A3 20000712; EP 0993514 A1 20000419; EP 0993514 B1 20020417; EP 0993514 B2 20061129; ES 2175705 T3 20021116; ES 2175705 T5 20070616; HK 1030638 A1 20030704; JP 2002507256 A 20020305; KR 100467014 B1 20050124; RU 2000102362 A 20040320; RU 2170785 C1 20010720; TR 9903334 T2 20000721; US 6220308 B1 20010424; WO 9901599 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090528

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEXTILMA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090531

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-04-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2007-02-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-02-06 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2006-12-29 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-11-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-03-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175705

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803865

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990902

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE